This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 14:50:10 (UTC).

Madeline Pevsner v Gilpin; Thomas udd

Case Summary

On 05/07/2010 Madeline Pevsner filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gilpin Thomas udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0630

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pevener, Madeline

Defendants

Gilpin, Johnathan

Thomas, Lasha

Others

Collectibles Management Resources

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Other Attorney

Pevsner, Madeline

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Final retutn to court writ of execution filed, wholly unsatisfied. IH 12/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketAssignment of judgment filed; Comment: Assignment of judgment filed assigning collection to Collectibles Management Resources psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL33709.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketWrit of execution issued; Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $2122.49 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMemo of costs after judgment; Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $113.94 Costs: $0.00 psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketCourt judgment; Comment: Witnesses sworn, exhibits filed. Court orders judgment for Plaintiff Madeline Pevsnek against Defendant Johnathan Gilpin; Lasha Thomas in the sum of: Principal: $825 Interest: $718.55 Costs: $440 Attorney fees: $0 Total: $1983.55 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Filed; Comment: cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketWrit filed satisfied poss only; Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 14-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 14-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 14-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 14-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 14-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$220.00 was made on receipt CLCL29964.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketNotice of UD Dismissal Hrg; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 07-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collectibles Management Resources is a litigant