This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:47:44 (UTC).

Lyndow Financial vs. Darrell Pettigrew

Case Summary

On 09/28/2016 Lyndow Financial filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Darrell Pettigrew. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gamoian, Lisa, Dalesandro, Samuel and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2229

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gamoian, Lisa

Dalesandro, Samuel

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lyndow Financial

Cosmopolitan Finance

Defendant

Pettigrew, Darrell M.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Lyndow Financial; Awarded Against:; Pettigrew, Darrell M.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $120.00; Total: $2620.00; Party Names: Lyndow Financial; Pettigrew, Darrell M.

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: $50.00 per pay period

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Alfonso Orozco

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed.

Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed

Claim of Exemption Notice of Hearing and Opposition filed

Claim of Exemption Notice of Hearing and Oppositio

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,693.81

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $ 0.00 Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 48.81

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Alonso Orozco, Collector

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Alfonso Orozco, Collector

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Continuance for service in court (Last Continuance)

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Lyndow Financial; Awarded Against:; Pettigrew, Darrell M.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $120.00; Total: $2620.00; Party Names: Lyndow Financial; Pettigrew, Darrell M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: $50.00 per pay period

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Alfonso Orozco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Claim of Exemption- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Brenda @ ph# 221-0400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed.- Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of Exemption Notice of Hearing and Opposition filed- Claim of Exemption Notice of Hearing and Oppositio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,693.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $ 0.00 Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 48.81

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • Financial info for Pettigrew, Darrell M.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00018147 Pettigrew, Darrell M. $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Financial info for Pettigrew, Darrell M.: Transaction Assessment $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Financial: Pettigrew, Darrell M.; Total Financial Assessment $0.50; Total Payments and Credits $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Financial info for Lyndow Financial: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00016772 Lyndow Financial $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Financial info for Lyndow Financial: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Financial info for Lyndow Financial: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00008992 Lyndow Financial $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Financial info for Lyndow Financial: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for Lyndow Financial: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033389 Lyndow Financial $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for Lyndow Financial: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial: Lyndow Financial; Total Financial Assessment $185.00; Total Payments and Credits $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.