This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 17:50:55 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs Vincent Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 09/04/2009 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vincent Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Sanger Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0310

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding, LLC.

Defendant

Gonzalez, Vincent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunt, Michael S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketFile Destroyed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketDismissed by court- Comment: Court orders action dismissed without prejudice. kjr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketMinute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Sanger Clerk: K. Rospigliosi Tape: 11:09:25 am Nature of Hearing: Collection Case Review Hearing Appearing Parties: PLTF: LVNV Funding, LLC. - Not Present PATY: Mark Johnson - Present DEFT: Vincent Gonzalez - Not Present Dismissed without prejudice requested by plaintiff's counsel granted by the court. kjr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketClerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-MAR-2010 by KROSPIGLIOSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketCCR Minutes Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-MAR-2010 by KROSPIGLIOSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 09-SEP-2009 by KROSPIGLIOSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$205.00 was made on receipt CLSA5685.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S