This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:07 (UTC).

Luis Gomez vs Michael Alarcon/UD/JUDGMENT

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Luis Gomez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Alarcon/UD/JUDGMENT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1510

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gomez, Luis

Defendants

Alarcon, Michael

Gutierrez, Maribel

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gomez, Luis

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE345304.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $7085.00. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-MAY-2014 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) Michael Alarcon, Maribel Gutierrez signed by Judge D Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff(s) Luis Gomez against Defendant(s) Michael Alarcon, Maribel Gutierrez in the amount of: Past due rent: $ 2400.00 Holdover damages: $ 4270.00 Attorney Fees: $ Costs: $ 390.00 Total: $ 7060.00 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J Verbera Reporter: 1:59:53 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Luis Gomez Money damages granted see signed order Luis Gomez is sworn and testifies. Court takes judicial notice of the rental agreement, 3-day notice and proof of service already in the court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived.. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Money Damage on 5/5/14 at 14:00 in dept # 401. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration for default judgment by court filed. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Michael Alarcon on 12/17/2013. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 17-DEC-2013 by KCLUGSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323954.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 ed Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less