This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:22 (UTC).

Luis Cruz vs. Rodney Greer/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Luis Cruz filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rodney Greer/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1531

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cruz, Luis

Defendant

Greer, Rodney

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cruz, Luis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE327308.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. A payment of $25.00 was made on receipt number CLCE327308 . The money was deposited into Trust on original receipt number CLCE326371, writ issued today. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI Hearing scheduled for 02/24/14. Clerk's judgment entered on 01/24/14. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff Luis Cruz against defendant Rodney Greer on 01/24/14 for restitution of the premises only 2036 E. Indianapolis Ave "C" Fresno, CA 93726. ***Copies placed in tickler under "C"*** lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Default previously entered on 12/24/13. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Deposit, Payment or Disbursmnt- Comment: Payment type: Cash Amount: $25.00 Receipt no: CLCE326371 Payment for: Writ MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: W/JUDGMENT MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of DOES 1 to 10 ONLY defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 17-DEC-2013 by KCLUGSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE324010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 MM Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MMEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Financial info for Cruz, Luis: Counter Payment Receipt # 327308 Cruz, Luis $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Financial info for Cruz, Luis: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Financial: Cruz, Luis; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less