This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 15:34:12 (UTC).

Louise Gomez vs. Linda Chavez Gomez Espinoza/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 Louise Gomez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Linda Chavez Gomez Espinoza/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3918

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gomez, Louise C

Macias, Sophie Gomez

Fernandez, Pauline

Defendants

Romero, De Layne M.

Chavez Gomez Espinosa, Linda

Fernandez, Pauline A.

Chavez Gomez Espinoza, Linda

Esqueda, Paul

Esqueda, Cecelia

All Occupants

Chavez Gomez, Louise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Abrams, Robert C

Zavala, Gilbert

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Robert C. Abrams in Support of Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to hear Pauline Fernandez's and Delayne M. Romero's Motion to Bifurcate the Trial of the Unlawful Detainer Matter

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Submission order

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( minute order ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 3/21/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Unverified Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Unverified Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request Filed

Request; Comment: Request

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( minute order ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 4/19/17 ) . Parties served: ( Linda Chavez Gomez Espinoza, Gilbert Zavala, Robert Abrams )

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Louise Gomez in rebuttal to defendant's contentions in opposition to request for injunction

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: plaintiff's rebuttal to defendant's contentions in opposition to request for injunction

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT PAULINE A. FERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW AS TO WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW AS TO WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED; DECLARATION OF LINDA CHAVEZ GOMEZ ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED; DECLARATION OF PAULINE A. FERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

Ex parte Filed

Ex Parte Application; Comment: Ex Parte Application

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Gomez, Louise C; Chavez Gomez Espinoza, Linda; Macias, Sophie Gomez; Fernandez, Pauline A.; Romero, De Layne M.; Comment: without prejudice - complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Total Costs: $1147.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Clerk to verify if the TSC stated in the Order signed on 3/22/17 will take off the CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Motion - Bifurcate- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: Set from 5/9/17 exparte

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial info for Macias, Sophie Gomez: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial: Macias, Sophie Gomez; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Financial info for Chavez Gomez Espinoza, Linda: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-04989 Chavez Gomez Espinosa, Linda $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Financial info for Chavez Gomez Espinoza, Linda: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Financial: Chavez Gomez Espinoza, Linda; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial info for Gomez, Louise C: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-05520 Gomez, Louise C $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial info for Gomez, Louise C: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial info for Gomez, Louise C: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-56803 Gomez, Louise C $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial info for Gomez, Louise C: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial: Gomez, Louise C; Total Financial Assessment $120.00; Total Payments and Credits $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less