This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 16:37:01 (UTC).

Lorraine Neal vs. John Ortiz

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 Lorraine Neal filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against John Ortiz. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1857

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neal, Lorraine

Defendants

Ortiz, Melody

Ortiz, John

Ortiz, Della

Ortiz, Elvira

Laplante, Mike

Chavez, Gilbert

Ortiz, Elvira Marie

Dick, Loren

Deceased

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Freedman, Darryl B.

Defendant Attorney

Church, Rayma J.

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

Stipulation; Comment: *****Case is not at issue***** Party(s) who signed: Rayma Church, Esq and Darryl B. Freedman ADR method chosen: Mediation

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Defendants Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Lorraine Neal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendants, Elvira Ortiz and Della Ortiz' Answer to the First Amended Complaint

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Amended Document Filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Complaint-First Amended

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons-Gilbert Chavez

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint-John Ortiz

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Neal, Lorraine; Ortiz, John; Ortiz, Elvira; Ortiz, Della; Ortiz, Melody; Chavez, Gilbert; Laplante, Mike; Dick, Loren; Comment: with prejudice.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: ELVIRA MARIE ORTIZ

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of summons

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: ELVIRA ORTIZ

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons-First Amended

Amended Document Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet-First Amended

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendants, Elvira Ortiez and Della Ortiz' Answer to the First Amended Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Neal, Lorraine; Ortiz, John; Ortiz, Elvira; Ortiz, Della; Ortiz, Melody; Chavez, Gilbert; Laplante, Mike; Dick, Loren; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Continued for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: Defendants Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendants Elvira Ortiz and Della Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for Ortiz, Elvira: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-53930 Ortiz, Elvira $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for Ortiz, Elvira: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Financial info for Ortiz, Elvira: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-47622 Ortiz, Elvira $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Financial info for Ortiz, Elvira: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Financial: Ortiz, Elvira; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Financial info for Neal, Lorraine: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-42480 Neal, Lorraine $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Financial info for Neal, Lorraine: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for Neal, Lorraine: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00020913 Darryl Freedman $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for Neal, Lorraine: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial: Neal, Lorraine; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.