This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:52:54 (UTC).

Lorena Mejia vs. MMZA LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 Lorena Mejia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MMZA LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Ikeda, Dale, Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Snauffer, Mark and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1863

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mejia, Lorena

Masad, Mohamad

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Auto Maxx, A Limited Liability Company

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., A Corporation

Wells Fargo Bank, National Association

MMZA LLC

Masad, Mohamad Arafat

MMZA, LLC, dba Auto MAXX,

Great American Insurance Company, A Corporation

Great Ameria Insurance

Auto Mzxx, a limited liability company

MMZA, LLC

Masad, Mohammad Arafat

Cross Defendant

Great American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman, David L.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Parvanian, Paul M.

Tomlin, Timothy J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Great American Insurance Company

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract of Judgment from Another Court; Comment: Amount: $6402.12

Notice Filed

Notice of Partial Settlement (signed).pdf; Comment: Partial Settlement. Notice of Settlement filed. No action taken, not filed on mandatory judicial council form. **Conditional settlement notice filed on 11/2/16**

Reply filed

Reply to Opposition to Demurrer.pdf; Comment: Reply to Opposition to Demurrer

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Request for Court Judgment

Request for court judgment.pdf

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Judgment Received

Judgment.pdf; Comment: Judgment signed and issued. FF to clerks office 10/03/2017, for further processing. Forwarded to RA 8/11/17

Answer Filed

Answer.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: re: Motion Strike, Demurrer

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: re: Demurrer, Mtn Strike

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Demurrer.pdf; Comment: Demurrer

Summons issued and filed

Summons on Cross-Complaint.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons as to 1st Cross-Complaint

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Mejia, Lorena; MMZA LLC; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association; Great American Insurance Company, A Corporation; Great American Insurance Company; MMZA, LLC; Masad, Mohamad Arafat; Masad, Mohamad; Great Ameria Insurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Great American Insurance Company; Masad, Mohamad Arafat; Comment: As to 1st Cross-Complaint only.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Great American Insurance Company; Awarded Against:; Masad, Mohamad Arafat; Amount; Attorney Fees: $5,658.50; Costs: $743.62; Total: $6402.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: MMZA, LLC; Comment: and Roes 1-100 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Mejia, Lorena; MMZA LLC; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association; Great American Insurance Company, A Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice as to the Original Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Case Status Review- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:34 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Case Status Review- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:34 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract of Judgment from Another Court; Comment: Amount: $6402.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: Transaction Assessment $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-74438 Mejia, Lorena $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-48454 Mejia, Lorena $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-41507 Mejia, Lorena $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00020970 Advanced Attorney Services, Inc $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for Mejia, Lorena: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial: Mejia, Lorena; Total Financial Assessment $661.00; Total Payments and Credits $661.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.