This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 16:21:50 (UTC).

Lon Norwood vs. John Kochergen/DIS

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 Lon Norwood filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against John Kochergen/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0688

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norwood, Lon

Defendants

Kochergen, John

Kochergen, Deborah

Others

Gilmore, David M.

All Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:15 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. Off calendar for UDDI set for 9/11/12 rls Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 16-AUG-2012 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Unlawful Detainer Dismissal Hearing on 9/11/12 at 1:15 pm in dept #401. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J. Verbera Reporter: 2/50/10 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal Hearing. Continued to 9/11/12 at 1:15 pm in Department 401 for same. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Certificate of mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the NOTICE OF CALENDAR SETTING was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: CLOVIS, California on 7/27/12. Parties served: PLAINTIFF. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 27-JUL-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 29-JUN-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 29-JUN-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL39516.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 lmi Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less