Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:13:52 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Shauntell Marie Yancey/JU

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shauntell Marie Yancey/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2077

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp.

Defendant

Yancey, Shauntell Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 6893.10

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $354.00 Interest: $1543.05

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration Regarding Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 6893.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration Regarding Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $354.00 Interest: $1543.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied- Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE348255.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Orange in the amount of $5,704.05 ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE348252.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325268.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 02-JAN-2014 by MMEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-56796 Lobel Financial Corp. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp.; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less