This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:04 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Shaunta Arredondo

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shaunta Arredondo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2110

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendant

Arredondo, Shaunta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $36.48 Interest: $2,612.25

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration Regarding Interest

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Sacramento Amount: $10,505.34

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Sacramento Amount: $10,505.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration Regarding Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $36.48 Interest: $2,612.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued CMC; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE337661.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for cmc scheduled for 7/21/14 hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on 5/19/14 entire action upon default of defendant Shaunta Arredondo signed by Judge Cabrera and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Lobel Financial Corp a California corporation against Shaunta Arredondo in the amount of: Principal: $ 6,434.57 Interest: $505.00 Attorney Fees: $640.00 Costs: $325.00 Total: $7,904.57 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: 401 ja

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-JAN-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-14218 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325486 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $250.00; Total Payments and Credits $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less