This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:17:36 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Sean G Mitchell/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sean G Mitchell/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2114

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendant

Mitchell, Sean G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued CMC; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. Off calendar for CMC 08-25-14 mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 24-JUN-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Case Management Conf Minutes- Comment: Case Management Conference continued to 08/25/2014 at 9:00am in Room 104 . Reason: Service csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 19-JUN-2014 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 19-JUN-2014 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 19-JUN-2014 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Case Management Conf Stmt- Comment: Case Management Conference Statement filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325495.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-JAN-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325495 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less