This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:17:57 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Reynita Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Reynita Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2113

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendant

Gonzalez, Reynita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: RE: Interest

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $394.00 Interest: $ 1553.77

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 9003.10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 9003.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration Filed; Comment: RE: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $394.00 Interest: $ 1553.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE334607.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE334605.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 7,843.33 hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-JAN-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed l lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00017998 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325493 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $250.00; Total Payments and Credits $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less