This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:10 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Maria Solano

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Maria Solano. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2111

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendant

Solano, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE334635.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for cmc scheduled for 4/21/14 hf.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on 3/28/14 entire action upon default of defendant Maria Solano signed by Judge Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Lobel Financial Corp a California corporation against Maria Solano in the amount of: Principal: $ 3,617.00 Interest: $258.78 Attorney Fees: $360.00 Costs: $295.00 Total: $4,530.78 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: dept 401 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M Cravens per ccp 585 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Maria Solano on 1/13/14 hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325488.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-JAN-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325488 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less