This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:17:50 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Jose Hernandez

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jose Hernandez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2112

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendants

Hernandez, Jose

Zarate, Ifrain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE344942.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for osc scheduled for 9/8/14 judgment entered hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on 9/8/14 entire action upon default of defendant Ifrain Zaratesigned by Judge Cabrera and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Lobel Financial Corp a California corporation against Ifrain Zarate in the amount of: Principal: $ 6,280.51 Interest: $1,140.76 Attorney Fees: $630.00 Costs: $375.00 Total: $8,426.27 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to:dept 404 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 28-AUG-2014 by MMENDOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Motion for continuance granted- Comment: Cont for OSC from 8-29-14 to 11-21-14, pending request for entry of judgment mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325492.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-JAN-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325492 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less