This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:17:44 (UTC).

Lobel Financial vs. Joelle N Rosales

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Joelle N Rosales. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2115

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendants

Rosales, Joelle N.

Murrillo III, Joe A.

Murrillo, Joe A., III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

 

Court Documents

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Declaration Filed

433015 dec.pdf; Comment: Declaration Regarding Interest

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Tulare Amount: $9,833.18

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

433015 memo.pdf; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $346.00 Interest: $ 2,376.89

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Tulare Amount: $9,833.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- 433015 dec.pdf; Comment: Declaration Regarding Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- 433015 memo.pdf; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $346.00 Interest: $ 2,376.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied- Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued OSC; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:01 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE336738.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE336735.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Tulare in the amount of $ 7,802.29 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-43918 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325499 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $250.00; Total Payments and Credits $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less