This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 02:37:00 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp vs Jeff Lightfoot/JU

Case Summary

On 09/01/2011 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeff Lightfoot/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1164

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corporation, A California Corporation

Defendants

Lightfoot, Jeff

Lightfoot, Sheila

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Writ filed partially satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $553.60 MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL38702.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $3,892.87 . jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL38701.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) Jeff Lightfoot and Sheila Lightfoot signed by Judge Gregory T. Fain and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation against Jeff Lightfoot and Sheila Lightfoot in the amount of: Principal: $2,836.09 Interest: $386.78 Attorney Fees: $280.00 Costs: $365.00 Total: $3,867.87 jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: Dept. Clovis jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M. Cravens pursuant to CCP1033 filed. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M. Cravens per CCP585 filed. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2011
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Jane Doe, Co-occupant, mailed on 10/11/11. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of due diligence filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Jane Doe, Co-Occupant, mailed on 10/11/11. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of due diligence filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL36401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.