This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 05:44:30 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp vs Glyn R Brown/CC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2010 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Glyn R Brown/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0848

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corporation, A California Corporation

Defendants

Brown, Glyn R

Smotherman, Sarah A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corp

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Presiding Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Return filed- Comment: Final Return to Court Writ of Execution Wholly Unsatisfied filed. mmt 12/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL32244.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL32243.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $5,205.77. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 12/23/10. judgment entered. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Presiding default judgment- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Fain on 10/26/10, Court orders judgment for plaintiff Lobel Financial Corp. against defendant(s) Glyn R Brown; Sarah A Smotherman in the sum of : Principal: $4,007.55 Interest: $428.22 Atty Fees: $400.00 Costs: $345.00 Total: $5,180.77 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: Judge Fain vs

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2010
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M. Cravens Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M Cravens pursuant to C.C.P. 585 filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Sarah A. Smotherman on 6-21-10 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Tamara Brownm, mother, mailed on 6-28-10 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$205.00 was made on receipt CLCL30404.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 08-JUN-2010 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.