This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:57 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp vs. Eric Ryan Hilton

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Eric Ryan Hilton. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2109

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendants

Hilton, Eric Ryan

Hilton, Anna

Other

Hilton, Lisa Anna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801-2605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Writ filed wholly unsatisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. BED 01/05/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Return filed- Comment: Return of writ of execution issued on 8-6-14 filed wholly unsatisfied. ae

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE340959.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 6,309.94 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 179.20 Costs: $ 105.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE336465.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE336464.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of San Diego in the amount of $6,025.74 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325483.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-JAN-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 325483 Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less