This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 04:35:47 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp v Jacinto Trevino

Case Summary

On 04/16/2012 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jacinto Trevino. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0472

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendant

Trevino, Jacinto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corp

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed partially satisfied in the amount $3510.17

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed partially satisfied in the amount $3510.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CLCE298236.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of LOS ANGELES in the amount of $11,399.89. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on12/7/12 entire action upon default of defendant Jacinto Trevino signed by Judge Cabrera and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Lobel Financial Corp. a California Corporation against Jacinto Trevino in the amount of: Principal: $ 8,931.30 Interest: $1,228.59 Attorney Fees: $890.00 Costs: $325.00 Total: $11,374.89 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: dept 404 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2012
  • Mail Payment Moved to Trust- Comment: Payment type:check Amount: $50.00 Receipt no:CECL287051 Payment for: abstract and writ to be issued. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M.Cravens per ccp 585 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment (logged 9/17/12 cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Jacinto Trevino hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice.. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of due diligence filed. jv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on John Doe, mailed on 06-21-12. jv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL38841.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . CM Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less