This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 15:01:54 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp. v Gonzales; Negrete

Case Summary

On 06/18/2012 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gonzales Negrete. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0692

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation

Defendants

Gonzales, Monica

Negrete, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Ronald J

 

Court Documents

Writ Partially Satisfied

Writ Partially Satisfied; Comment: In the amount of: $3,782.82

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Partially Satisfied- Writ Partially Satisfied; Comment: In the amount of: $3,782.82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Writ filed wholly unsatisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. mmt 3/18/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE317867.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Tulare in the amount of $6,428.42 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 387.11 Costs: $ 129.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CLCE298311.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of TULARE in the amount of $5,912.31 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on 1/7/13 entire action upon default of defendant(s) Monica Gonzales and Sarah Negrete signed by Judge Cabrera and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation against Monica Gonzales and Sarah Negrete in the amount of: Principal: $ 4,488.57 Interest: $583.74 Attorney Fees: $450.00 Costs: $365.00 Total: $5,887.31 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M Cravens pursuant to ccp 585 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Dianne M Cravens pursuant to ccp 1033 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Monica Gonzales for Sarah Negrete, mailed on 7/25/12. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service by mail. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Due Diligence as to Sarah Negrete filed. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Monica Gonzales on 7/23/12. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL39542.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less