This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 05:24:33 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp. v Edwin Pacheco

Case Summary

On 04/23/2012 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Edwin Pacheco. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0476

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp.

Defendant

Pacheco, Edwin

Other

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Huang, Shiao-Wen

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: RE: Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $60.00 Credit: $190.72 Interest: $ 4304.92

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount:$11,876.16

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $190.72 Interest: $ 2836.30

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: RE:Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Presiding Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: RE: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $60.00 Credit: $190.72 Interest: $ 4304.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount:$11,876.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $190.72 Interest: $ 2836.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration Filed; Comment: RE:Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Writ filed partially satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $226.72 jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Return filed- Comment: Return of Writ issued on 12/4/12 filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL38853.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . CM Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-60120 Lobel Financial Corp. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00005901 Lobel Financial Corp. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Financial info for Lobel Financial Corp.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Financial: Lobel Financial Corp.; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less