This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 06:29:21 (UTC).

Lisa Garcia vs. Narayana Ambati, M.D./Dismissed

Case Summary

On 05/09/2011 Lisa Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Narayana Ambati, M D /Dismissed. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Bruce, McGuire, Rosemary, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1556

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Bruce

McGuire, Rosemary

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Lisa

Defendants

Narayana Ambati, M.D.

Urology Associates of Central California, LLC

Fresno Community Hospital

Wolfe M.D., Mary

Russell PA, Jeffrey

Wolfe, Mary, Medical Doctor

Russell, Jeffrey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fourchy, Patrick

3716 North First Street

Fresno, CA 93726

Defendant Attorneys

Beltramo Jr., Mario L.

Mccormick, Barstow Po Box 28912 7647 N. Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Paloutzian, Dirk B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Continued 225 Dismissal- Original Type: Continued 225 Dismissal; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 225 scheduled for 09-16-13. Dismissed gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed With prejudice. gs Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • CRC225 Dismissal Hrg Minutes- Comment: CRC 225 Dismissal hearing continued to 09/16/2013 at 1:00pm in Room 104 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 01:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 13-JUN-2013 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 13-JUN-2013 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Patrick Fourchy regarding dismissal hearing filed. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2011
  • Financial info for Urology Associates of Central California, LLC: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Financial: Urology Associates of Central California, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Financial info for Narayana Ambati, M.D.: Counter Payment Receipt # 168346 Narayana Ambati, M.D. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Financial info for Narayana Ambati, M.D.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Financial info for Narayana Ambati, M.D.: Counter Payment Receipt # 158232 Narayana Ambati, M.D. $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Financial info for Narayana Ambati, M.D.: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Financial: Narayana Ambati, M.D.; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • Financial info for Garcia, Lisa: Counter Payment Receipt # 152304 Garcia, Lisa $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • Financial info for Garcia, Lisa: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • Financial: Garcia, Lisa; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wolfe, Mary M., Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where UROLOGY ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paloutzian, Dirk B.