This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/10/2018 at 21:28:58 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 08/21/2014 XXXXX was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2461

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anderson, Linda J.

Anderson, Lloyd

Defendants

Western Health Resources

Coalinga Regional Medical Center

Beverly Healthcare-California, Inc.

Community Hospitals of Central California

Han M.D., Hongshik

Smith M.D., Kenneth

Sams M.D., O'Key Ijomanta

Griffin M.D., Paul

Sammarian Medical Group, Inc.

dba Ralph Neate Extended Care Center

dba Clovis Community Medical Center

Griffin, Paul, Medical Doctor

dba Community Medical Center - Fresno and Community Medical Center - Clovis

FresnoCommunity Hospital and Medical Center

dba Golden Living Center-Hy-Long

Han, Hongshik, Medical Doctor

dba Community Regional Medical Center

Sams, O'Key Ijomanta, Medical Doctor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chatoian, Edward B.

2607 Fresno Street Suite #C

Fresno, CA 93721

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Oberto, Richard M.

Salinas, Richard S

Giovanniello, Alexander F.

Ginns, Scott A

Jones, Jerry D.

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Ball, Michael F.

Thelen, Kevin E.

Other Attorneys

Wood, Richard Alan

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Norman D Morrison IV in Support of Compliance with CCP 430.41

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Demurrer

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Edward B. Chatoian re: defendant Hongshik Han's demurrer to the 39th cause of action in plaintiffs' second amended complaint

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: To Second Amended Complaint

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Default Denied as to Kenneth Smith MD Reason: Date on line 1a is incorrect, an Amended Complaint was filed. Also, a Proof of Service as to Statement of Damages was not Filed.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Demurrer/Motion to strike as to Coalinga Regional Medical Center

Objection filed

Objection filed; Comment: to Statement of Damages of Plaintiff Lloyd Anderson

Reply filed

Civil Document

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to 2nd Amended Complaint, Pg 67, line 20, request for punitive damages under CCP 3294 & 3345 ONLY. Without Prejudice.)

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Errata regarding Exhibits Lodged in support of the Petition to Compel Contractual Arbitration and Motion to Stay by Defendant Beverly Healthcare-California, Inc. dba Golden LivingCenter-Hy-Lond

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: In Support of Demurrer to Second amended Complaint of Linda Anderson and Lloyd Anderson

Reply filed

Motion (No Fee); Comment: of Defendant Paul A. Griffin, M.D. re Defendant's Motion for Order Striking Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Civil Document

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: to second amended complaint

Reply filed

Reply filed; Comment: by Defendant O'Key Ijomanta Sams, M.D. to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

177 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (without Prejudice as to 30th, 40th, & 48th causes of action in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to the 39th Cause of Action of the Second Amended Complaint as to Defendant Hongshik Han Only. - Without Prejudice.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to 2nd Amended Complaint, Pg 67, line 20, request for punitive damages under CCP 3294 & 3345 ONLY. Without Prejudice.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sammarian Medical Group, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice as to Defendant Sammarian Medical Group Inc. ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Arbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Plaintiff's counsel to notify all parties of new date and time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Arbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- NTC.pdf; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: certificate of mailing attached

    Read MoreRead Less
306 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2016
  • Financial info for Western Health Resources: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00001559 Eddings Attorney Support SVCS, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Financial info for Western Health Resources: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Financial info for Western Health Resources: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00015570 White, William M. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Financial info for Western Health Resources: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Financial info for Western Health Resources: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00015569 White, William M. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Financial info for Western Health Resources: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Financial: Western Health Resources; Total Financial Assessment $615.00; Total Payments and Credits $615.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Financial info for Anderson, Linda J.: Counter Payment Receipt # 197761 Anderson, Linda J. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Financial info for Anderson, Linda J.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Financial: Anderson, Linda J.; Total Financial Assessment $150.00; Total Payments and Credits $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FILED BY FAX

WEISS MARTIN SALINAS & HEARST

A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION . DEC 2§ 2015

7108 No(r:th Fresno Street, Suite 250 Fresno, California 93720 RIOR COURT

(559) 438-2080 FRESNO SUPH

(559) 438-8363 Facsimile By SERUTY

Attorneys for Defendants COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER and COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER dba RALPH NEATE EXTENDED CARE CENTER

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO

LINDA J. ANDERSON LLOYD ANDERSON,

Case No. 14CECG02461 KCK

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER M.

URONE AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT O F DEFENDANTS COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AND COALINGA REGIONAL

MEDICAL CENTER d/b/a RALPH NEATE

EXTENDED CARE CENTER’S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS’

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT .

14CECG02461

Plaintiffs, v |

I WESTERN HEALTH RESOURCES d/b/a ADVENTIST HOME HEALTH CARE;

COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL

CENTER; COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d/b/a RALPH NEATE EXTENDED CARE CENTER; BEVERLY HEALTHCARE-CALIFORNIA, INC. d/b/a GOLDEN LIVING CENTER-HY-LOND;

COMMUNITY HOSPITALS OF CENTRAL

F Declaratlon Flled

DATE: February 23, 2016 TIME: 3:30 p.m. DEPT: 403

REGIONAL MEDICAL; CENTER;

COMMUNITY HOSPITALS OF CENTRAL

CALIFORNIA d/b/a CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER; HONGSHIK HAN, M.D.; KENNETH SMITH M.D.; O’KEY IJOMANTA SAMS M.D.; PAUL GRIFFIN M.D. and DOES 1 through 150, inclusive, Action filed: August 21, 2014 | Trial date: None

VVVVVVUVVVVV\JV\/WVVUVVVVV

Defendarilts.

| I, Christopher M. Urone, hereby declare as follows:.

1. I am an afiorney duly authorized to practice before the Courts of the State of California and I am a partner in the law firm of Weiss Martin Salinas & Hearst, attorneys for Defendants COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (“Coalinga Regional”) and

1. I am an afiorney duly authorized to practice before the Courts of the State of California and I am a partner in the law firm of Weiss Martin Salinas & Hearst, attorneys for Defendants COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (“Coalinga Regional”) andAdenc s e mu s neaete 200NNuhal .t s e LRI I . - L2 . . e . : : . cimesem . .

Adenc s e mu s neaete 200NNuhal .t s e LRI I . - L2 . . e . : : . cimesem . .

COALINGA REGIONA_L MEDICAL CENTER d/b/a RALPH NEATE EXTENDED CARE CENTER (“Ralph Neat<:3”) (cdllectively referred to herein as “Moving Defendants™). I declare that I have personal knozwledge of the following facts and that I make this Declaration based upon my personal knowlledge. Further, I declare that if called as a witness, I could and would competently testify theré:to. ' 2. Attached!ihereto as Exhibit “1,” and fully incorporated herein by this reference, is | a true and correct copy (!’.f this Court’s Order, dated November 5, 2015. It is respectfully requested that this Courl;: take judicial notice of this Order, as it was previously filed with this Court in the course and fs".cope of the pending litigation, and is still on file. Evidence Code §§

I 450, 451, 452 and 453.

3. Attached hereto as Exhibit “2,” and fully incorporated herein by this reference, is a true and correct copy of Plaintiffs’ Second Amended Complaint. Tt is reépectfully requested that the Court take judic’.ial notice of the Second Amended Complaint, as it was previously filed with this Court in the cogurse and scope of the pending litigation, and is still on file. Evidence Code §§ 450, 451, 452 a}:rld 453,

4, Attached heretc; as E);hibit “3,” and fully incorporated herein by this reference, is a true and correct copy of the Declaration of Sandra Earls, which was filed with Moving Defendants previous Def’l:nurrer and Motion to Strike. It is respectfully requested that this Court take judicial notice of tfic Declaration, as it was previously filed with this Court in the course and scope of the pending litigation, and is still on file. Evidence Code §§ 450, 451, 452 and 453.

I declare under the penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the

. . st foregoing is true and coirect. This Declaration is executed on this 2{ day of December 2015,

in Fresno, California. m

CHRISTOPHER M. URONE

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER M. URONE AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |-