This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 22:33:28 (UTC).

Lee Schmidt vs Krystle Schmidt

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Lee Schmidt filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Krystle Schmidt. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zepeda, Francine, Tharpe, D Tyler, Mangano, Robert and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3203

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zepeda, Francine

Tharpe, D Tyler

Mangano, Robert

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Schmidt, Lee

Respondent

Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore

Minor

Schmidt, Davin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jennifer L. Walters

Respondent Attorney

Hall, Robin M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Modification OSC/Motion- Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: CV - hrg set per phone call from Atty Robin Hall for Resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: D Flautz Court Reporter: R Lundy Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner not present Attorney present: Jennifer L Walters Respondent not present Attorney present: Robin M Hall Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 10/16/19 Time: 9:30 a.m. Dept.: 202 Other: Counsel state the parties are still dealing with custody and financial issues and request that the matter have a six-month continuance. Court sets the matter for further status conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Petitioner; Parties Present- Attorney: Jennifer L. Walters; Parties Present- Respondent; Parties Present- Attorney: Hall, Robin M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Judge Mangano minute order. See attached.- Comment: Dept: 201 Time: 9:42 am Judge: R. Mangano Clerk: K. Reeves Reporter: Lynn Hergenrader Petitioner:Present: Counsel:Jennifer Walters Respondent:Not Present: Counsel: Robin Hall Other: Canon 3 Disclosure given by Judge Mangano. Continued to: 6/7/19: 8:15: Dept: 201:Review/CS The matter is continued to allow the child support to be heard with the readiness hearing. The parties agree to exchange financial documents on or before 5/30/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Review- Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion; Parties Present- Petitioner: Schmidt, Lee; Parties Present- Attorney: Jennifer L. Walters; Parties Present- Respondent; Parties Present- Attorney: Hall, Robin M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Modification OSC/Motion - Re: Custody/Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Judge Mangano minute order. See attached.- Comment: Dept: 201 Time: 9:39 am Judge: R. Mangano Clerk: W. Baeza Reporter: R. Lundy Petitioner:Present: Counsel: Jennifer Walters Respondent:Present: Counsel: Robin Hall Continued to: 5/15/19: 9:00 am: Dept: 201: Further Review Other: Canon 3 Disclosure given by Judge Mangano All parties agree to continue this matter for a further review. Court grants the request for a continuance. Both parties shall bring DissoMasters at the next hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-00602 Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-45130 Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Financial: Schmidt, Krystle Lyn Clymore; Total Financial Assessment $640.00; Total Payments and Credits $640.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Lee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-51024 Schmidt, Lee $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Lee: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Lee: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00007717 Schmidt, Lee $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial info for Schmidt, Lee: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial: Schmidt, Lee; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.