This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 14:25:43 (UTC).

Laura Mather vs Mark Mather

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 Laura Mather filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Mark Mather. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Hopper, Cindy and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3094

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Hopper, Cindy

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mather, Laura

Respondent

Mather, Mark

Minor

Mather, Jordan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tatarian, Brian I

Respondent Attorney

Lerandeau, Paul E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: L Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner not present Respondent not present Attorney present: Lawton Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 9/10/19 Time: 9:30 a.m. Dept.: 202 Other: Parties are working on case. Matter continued for further case status conference. Hearing set 5/8/2019 is vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Family Case Management- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Filing Party Laura Mather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: sent Request for Status Conference to FL Supervisor for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Declaration Filed- Comment: Case Information - Family Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice Filed- Comment: Request for Family Centered Case Resolution Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Proposed Documents- Comment: Accepted Pending Judge's Review/Signature - Request for Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Copies of Case Resolution w/envelopes to Efile tray

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Filed Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Financial info for Mather, Mark: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-54330 Mather, Mark $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Financial info for Mather, Mark: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Financial: Mather, Mark; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Financial info for Mather, Laura: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-09900 Mather, Laura $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Financial info for Mather, Laura: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Financial info for Mather, Laura: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-37817 Mather, Laura $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Financial info for Mather, Laura: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Financial: Mather, Laura; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.