This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 17:44:23 (UTC).

Larry Cohler, Medical Doctor vs. Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group, a California General Partnership

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 Larry Cohler, Medical Doctor filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group, a California General Partnership. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1089

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor

Defendant

Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group, a California General Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOGAN, GARY L

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group, a California General Partnership; Comment: With Prejudice.

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Valley Cardiac Medical Group

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP Hearing

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

08/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service

07/30/2018: Proof of Service

Notice

07/24/2018: Notice

Minute Order Attachment

07/23/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

07/09/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

06/08/2018: Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/02/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

03/29/2018: Summons

Summons

03/29/2018: Summons

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group, a California General Partnership; Comment: With Prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Valley Cardiac Medical Group

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 04/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Valley Cardiac Medical Group

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-22543 Cohler, Larry $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOGAN, GARY