This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:58:56 (UTC).

La Shawn Sims vs. Ellen Olivares

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 La Shawn Sims filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ellen Olivares. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7773

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sims, La Shawn

Defendant

Olivares, Ellen

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Sims, La Shawn; Olivares, Ellen; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Sims, La Shawn; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 3405 E. Terrace Ave Fresno CA 93703; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Olivares, Ellen

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: **Request for Clerks Judgment Filed**

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 5

At Issue Memorandum

At Issue Memorandum; Comment: DEFECTIVE - Case is not at Issue. Defendant has been defaulted.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Entered as to:

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Occupants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Ellen Olivares

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Answer could not be processed because a fee of $225 is required- or a Fee Waiver if applicable. Also, a Request for Default was received on 10/07/16. If you have any questions regarding your case please contact us at 559-457-1900.

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Sims, La Shawn; Olivares, Ellen; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Sims, La Shawn; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 3405 E. Terrace Ave Fresno CA 93703; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Olivares, Ellen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: **Request for Clerks Judgment Filed**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment Box #71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • At Issue Memorandum- At Issue Memorandum; Comment: DEFECTIVE - Case is not at Issue. Defendant has been defaulted.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2016
  • Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Received- Comment: Answer - Unlawful Detainer with no monies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for Sims, La Shawn: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00036496 Susan Lanier $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for Sims, La Shawn: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Sims, La Shawn: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033147 Susan Lanier $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Sims, La Shawn: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial: Sims, La Shawn; Total Financial Assessment $265.00; Total Payments and Credits $265.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.