This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 19:19:37 (UTC).

La Jolla Group II Management, Inc vs. Sergio Vasquez

Case Summary

On 06/28/2016 La Jolla Group II Management, Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sergio Vasquez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4928

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

La Jolla Group II Management, Inc

Defendants

Lopez-Lopez, Serveriano

Lopez, Serverano

Munoz, Jovita

Morales, Nicolas

Cruz, Antonio

Lopez, Misael

Vasquez, Sergio

Others

ALL OCCUPANTS

Collectibles Management Resources, A General Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R.

Other Attorney

Kelley, Donna L

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Morales, Nicolas; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $4,725.00; Holdover Damages: $2,112.00; Costs: $660.00; Total: $7,497.00; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Vasquez, Sergio; Cruz, Antonio; Lopez-Lopez, Serveriano; Lopez, Misael; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $4,725.00; Holdover Damages: $2,112.00; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $660.00; Total: $8,447.00

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Entered as to:

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract; Comment: Amount: $ 8447.00

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Steven R. Hrdlicka New Attorney: Donna L. Kelley

Assignment of Judgment Filed

Assignment of Judgment; Comment: Assigned to Collectibles Management Resources, A General Partnership

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of UDDI

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Munoz, Jovita; Comment: Request for Dismissal to include all DOES 1 to 10

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Morales, Nicolas; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $4,725.00; Holdover Damages: $2,112.00; Costs: $660.00; Total: $7,497.00; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Vasquez, Sergio; Cruz, Antonio; Lopez-Lopez, Serveriano; Lopez, Misael; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $4,725.00; Holdover Damages: $2,112.00; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $660.00; Total: $8,447.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; Vasquez, Sergio; Cruz, Antonio; Lopez-Lopez, Serveriano; Lopez, Misael; Morales, Nicolas; Munoz, Jovita; ALL OCCUPANTS; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 4758 E. Austin Way Fresno CA 93726; Awarded Against:; Vasquez, Sergio; Cruz, Antonio; Lopez-Lopez, Serveriano; Lopez, Misael; Morales, Nicolas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Munoz, Jovita; Comment: Request for Dismissal to include all DOES 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract; Comment: Amount: $ 8447.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Steven R. Hrdlicka New Attorney: Donna L. Kelley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment Filed- Assignment of Judgment; Comment: Assigned to Collectibles Management Resources, A General Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial info for La Jolla Group II Management, Inc: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-65809 La Jolla Group II Management, Inc $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial info for La Jolla Group II Management, Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Financial info for La Jolla Group II Management, Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00026506 Hrdlicka, Steven R. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Financial info for La Jolla Group II Management, Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial info for La Jolla Group II Management, Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00023361 Hrdlicka, Steven R. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial info for La Jolla Group II Management, Inc: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial: La Jolla Group II Management, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $290.00; Total Payments and Credits $290.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.