This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 01:31:49 (UTC).

Kristina Ash vs. S45, Inc

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 Kristina Ash filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against S45, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2685

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ash, Kristina

Defendants

Messinger, Glen

S45, Inc

KW Automotive North America, Inc.

The Suspension Source

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whelan, Brian D

Defendant Attorney

Taylor, Charles T

 

Court Documents

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference filed 02/27/2018

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Anthony N. DeMaria New Attorney: Charles Trudrung Taylor, Bar #: 127105

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference filed 01/24/2017

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: re: Opposition to Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: First Amended Complaint

Demurrer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Julie K. MacMichael in Support of Meet and Confer Requirment.

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Trial continued to: 07/30/2018 @ 9am D#501, TRR 07/27/2018 @ 9:30am D# 501, MSC 06/27/2018 @ 10am D#575

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: In Chambers Pretrial Discovery Conference

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Request; Comment: Forwarded (on 1/27/17) to Dept: 402

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Amended Document Filed

Amended Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: First amended answer

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: to file first amended complaint - granted

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in Support of Demurrer to Complaint.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Pre Trial Discovery Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference filed 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Opposition; Comment: Forwarded to dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Request; Comment: Forwarded to dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Trial continued to: 07/30/2018 @ 9am D#501, TRR 07/27/2018 @ 9:30am D# 501, MSC 06/27/2018 @ 10am D#575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2016
  • Financial: S45, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-71913 Ash, Kristina $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-55689 Ash, Kristina $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-49744 Ash, Kristina $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-36200 Ash, Kristina $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial info for Ash, Kristina: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial: Ash, Kristina; Total Financial Assessment $665.00; Total Payments and Credits $665.00

    Read MoreRead Less