This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 15:15:44 (UTC).

Kristin Cosentino vs Vincent Cosentino

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 Kristin Cosentino filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Vincent Cosentino. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3161

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cosentino, Kristin L.

Respondent

Cosentino, Vincent J.

Minor

Cosentino, James D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Final Judgment Dissolution/MSA; Party Names: Cosentino, Kristin L.; Cosentino, Vincent J.; Cosentino, James D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Family Code Section 2105 Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: sent judgment to FLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Request to Enter Default- Comment: as to respondent Vincent J Cosentino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default shelf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial info for Cosentino, Kristin L.: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial info for Cosentino, Kristin L.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial: Cosentino, Kristin L.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.