This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:27:35 (UTC).

Krissy Larkin vs Fate Moffitt - DISMISSED

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Krissy Larkin filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Fate Moffitt - DISMISSED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6670

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Larkin, Krissy

Fresno, CA 93705

Respondent

Moffitt, Fate

Minor

Moffitt, Fate F, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached.- Comment: Hrg: 4/20/2016 Time: 11:00 a.m. Dept: 202 Judge: D. Tharpe Clerk: M. Vang Reporter: NR Petitioner not present Respondent not present Hearing Type: Other: Dismissal Hearing Other: Good cause has not been shown as to why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute (CRC Rule 5.83(c)(4).) Accordingly, the case is hereby dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Dismissal Hearing- Original Type: Dismissal Hearing; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached.- Comment: Minute order from Dept.: 202 Clerk: E Flores Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family Centered Case Status Minute Order Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference. You are hereby ordered to appear in Department 202 on Wednesday, April 20, 2016, at 11:00 a.m., to show cause why the above-referenced case should not be dismissed. California law requires that Family Law matters proceed in an effective and timely manner from initial filing to final disposition. (Fam. Code 2450, subd. (a), and Standards of Judicial Administration, standard 5.30.) In deciding whether a case is progressing in an effective and timely manner, the Court considers procedural milestones, including the following: (A) A proof of service of summons and petition should be filed within 60 days of case initiation; (B) If no response has been filed, and the parties have not agreed on an extension of time to respond, a request to enter default should be submitted within 60 days after the date the response was due; (C) The petitioner's preliminary declaration of disclosure should be served within 60 days of the filing of the petition; (D) When a default has been entered, a judgment should be submitted within 60 days of the entry of default; (E) Whether a trial date has been requested or scheduled; and (F) When the parties have notified the court that they are actively negotiating or mediating their case, a written agreement for judgment is submitted within six months of the date the petition was filed, or a request for trial date is submitted. (Cal. Rule of Court, rule 5.83(c)(4).) The Court has reason to believe that the above-referenced case is not progressing in an effective and timely manner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 13-JAN-2015 by MNGUYEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Minute order Judge Tharpe- Comment: Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: M. Nguyen/T. Flores Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family-Centered Status Conf. Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present No appearnce, clerk to re-notice status conference Next family centered case resolution conference is set for: 03/01/16 at 10:30am in D202 mn 01/07/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-APR-2014 by TFLORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2014
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-APR-2014 by TFLORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 17-DEC-2013 by DCALABRESE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona dc 12/17/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 11/27/13 to present dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _X__ assigned to Judge Duncan dc 12/17/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes _X__ dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. dc 12/17/13 Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less