This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 04:22:44 (UTC).

Kondaur Capital Corp. v Helen Segura udd

Case Summary

On 05/27/2010 Kondaur Capital Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Helen Segura udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fain, Gregory, McGuire, Rosemary, Alvarez, Brian and Franson, Donald R. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0776

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fain, Gregory

McGuire, Rosemary

Alvarez, Brian

Franson, Donald R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kondaur Capital Corporation

Defendant

Segura, Helen

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaquez, L. Bryant

Defendant Attorney

Segura, Helen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 30-SEP-2011 by CSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • Case Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • Order for Dismissal of Appeal- Comment: Order for dismissal of appeal prior to trial signed by Judge D. Black filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order: Dismissal of Appeal Forwarded to: Fresno Civil Dept. Attn. Chan psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 25-JUL-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2010
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 27-MAY-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • Financial info for Segura, Helen: Counter Payment Receipt # 34521 Segura, Helen $265.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • Financial info for Segura, Helen: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • Financial info for Segura, Helen: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Financial info for Segura, Helen: Counter Payment Receipt # 32552 Segura, Helen $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Financial info for Segura, Helen: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Financial: Segura, Helen; Total Financial Assessment $490.00; Total Payments and Credits $490.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.