This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:39 (UTC).

Kings Credit vs. Ronald Christopher Luna/CC/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ronald Christopher Luna/CC/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2085

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services

Defendants

Luna, Ronald Christopher

Luna, Danyell J.

Others

Luna, Ronnie

Young, Danyell J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Maroot & Hardcastle 429 N. Redington St. Po Box 1759

Hanford, CA 93232

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. cg Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of reasonable diligence filed. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Ronald Christopher Luna, occupant, mailed on 1/17/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Ronald Christopher Luna aka Ronnie Luna on 1/16/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325283.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less