This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:21 (UTC).

Kings Credit vs. Maria E. Alvarez/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria E Alvarez/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2088

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services

Defendants

Alvarez, Maria E.

Alvarez, Ramiro L.

Other

RJ Auto Body

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Maroot & Hardcastle 429 N. Redington St. Po Box 1759

Hanford, CA 93232

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Return filed- Comment: Return of filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE348525.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 1,444.46 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 58.91 Costs: $ 116.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Return filed- Comment: Return of writ of execution issued on 6-20-14 filed wholly unsatisfied. ae

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE338032.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $ 1,330.05 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 4.50 Costs: $ 56.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Maria E. Alvarez on 1-25-14 mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Maria E. Alvarez, mailed on 1-28-14 . mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325302.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less