Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:33 (UTC).

Kings Credit vs. Emmanuel Camiro Aguino/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Emmanuel Camiro Aguino/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2084

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services

Defendants

Aquino, Emmanuel Camiro

Aquino, Mirna

Other

Camiro, Emmanuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Maroot & Hardcastle 429 N. Redington St. Po Box 1759

Hanford, CA 93232

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Writ filed not executed- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, not executed. th.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE335238.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $1,259.91 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 5.86 Costs: $ 0.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 4/11/14 for plaintiff Kings Credit Services a corporation against defendant(s) Emmanuel Camiro Aquino aka Emanuel Camiro and Mirna Aquino in the sum of: Principal: $641.52 Interest: $ 198.15 Atty Fees: $ 160.38 Costs: $ 229.00 Total: $1,229.5 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Order filed- Comment: Order the court having considered the foregoing declaration under ccp 585(d) as required by ccp 585(a) sets attorney fees in this action in the amount of $160.38dj signed by Judge Cabrera filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order: attorney fees Forwarded to: dept 404 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Emmanuel Camiro Aquino aka Emmanuel Camiro and Mirna Aquino hf

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2014
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of reasonable diligence filed. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Emmanuel Camiro Aquino aka Emmanuel Camiro on 1/16/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Emmanuel Camiroa, occupant, mailed on 1/21/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325276.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less