This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 16:53:53 (UTC).

Kings Credit VS Delgado/CCR

Case Summary

On 05/31/2012 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Delgado/CCR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County Reedley Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0169

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services, A Corporation

Defendants

Delgado, Lucy

Delgado, Michael David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HardCastle, V Wayne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketSubstitution of attorney filed; Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Kliever Law Group New atty: Maroot & Hardcastle. JL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketSatisfaction of judgment-full; Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. JL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketWrit filed wholly satisfied; Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. JL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketSubstitution of attorney filed; Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Jennifer Lee Giuliani New atty: Kliever Law Group LLP lmi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kings Credit Services, A Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 294702 Kings Credit Services, A Corporation $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kings Credit Services, A Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: Kings Credit Services, A Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE294702.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketWrit of execution issued; Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $1025.16 (Attorney tickler under "G") cg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketMemo of costs after judgment; Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $3.27 Costs: $0.00 cg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Carlos Salinas/Father in Law/Occupant , mailed on 6/17/12. jp .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Affidavit of Reasonable Due Diligence Declaration filed. jp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Carlos Salinas/Father/Occupant, mailed on 6/17/12. jp .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Affidavit of Reasonable Due Diligence Declaration filed. jp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLRE15125.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. jp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. jp Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee; Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Collections Complaint filed. jp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kings Credit Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hardcastle, V. Wayne