This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:50 (UTC).

Kings Credit vs. Brenda L. Cramsey/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brenda L Cramsey/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2087

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services

Defendants

Cramsey, Brenda L.

Cramsey Jr., Kenneth James

Cramsey, Kenneth James, JR

Others

Smith, Brenda

Cramsey Concrete Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Maroot & Hardcastle 429 N. Redington St. Po Box 1759

Hanford, CA 93232

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • Return filed- Comment: Final Return to Court Writ of Execution partially satisfied in the sum of $423.85 filed. af 01/29/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE337799.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 15,368.94 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 75.05 Costs: $ 56.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE336179.Money was original deposit into trust on originial receipt CECL332877. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 5/23/14 for plaintiff Kings Credit Services a corporation against defendant(s) Brenda L Cramsey aka Brenda Smith and Kenneth James Cramsey Jr individually and dba Cramsey Concrete Inc in the sum of: Principal: $ 12,436.51 Interest: $ 1,747.38 Atty Fees: $ 800.00 Costs: $ 229.00 Total: $15,212.89 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Order filed- Comment: Order the court having considered the foregoing declaration under ccp 585(d) as required by ccp 585(a) sets attorney fees in this action in the amount of $800.00 signed by Judge Ikeda filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration and application of Peter Laughlin for attorney fees pursuant to ccp 585(a) as required by ccp 585(d)filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Kenneth James Cramsey Jr individiaully & DBA Cramsey Concrete Inc. on 1/24/14. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of reasonable diligence re Brenda L Cramsey filed. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Kenneth James Cramsey Jr. Husband, mailed on 1/28/14 ja.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLCE325296.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . MM Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less