This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 00:02:35 (UTC).

Kings Credit vs Beltran et al/CC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2010 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Beltran /CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Selma Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Silva, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0597

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Silva, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services, A Corporation

Defendants and Others

Beltran, Florencio

Beltran, Maria R

Ramirez, Florencio B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Defendant Attorney

Beltran, Maria R

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

10/14/2015: Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE350350.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketWrit of execution issued; Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $ 876.81 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketMemo of costs after judgment; Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 3,000.00 Interest: $ 555.13 Costs: $ 171.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Final Return to Court Writ of Execution fully unsatisfied. Filed. af 12/02/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE338076.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • DocketWrit of execution issued; Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $1,285.65 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketMemo of costs after judgment; Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 2,500.00 Interest: $ 518.97 Costs: $ 116.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketWrit filed wholly unsatisfied; Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied.. CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE332764.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketCourt Fees Waived; Comment: $225.00 x 2 = $450.00 (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify: Answer filed sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketAnswer Complaint; Comment: Answer to Civil Complaint and summons filed. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Maria R Beltran on 10/5/10.th

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Florencio Beltran on 10/5/10.th

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLSE8216.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee; Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.th

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: th Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 27-AUG-2010 by THOWLETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kings Credit Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jolly, Tim