This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 09:57:05 (UTC).

Kings Credit vs Antonia Ramirez et al/CC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2010 Kings Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Antonia Ramirez /CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Selma Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Silva, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Silva, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services, a Corporation

Defendants

Ramirez, Juan B

Ramirez, Antonia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Jennifer Lee Giuliani New Attorney: Maroot & Hardcastle

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed

05/08/2017: Substitution of Attorney Filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

05/30/2017: Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Jennifer Lee Giuliani New Attorney: Maroot & Hardcastle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Final return to court Writ of execution filed partially satisfied in the sum of $1150.38 IH 10/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • DocketWrit filed partially satisfied; Comment: Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $1150.38 MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLSE8254.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketWrit of execution issued; Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $1,007.63 . sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketMemo of costs after judgment; Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $290.00 Interest: $40.36 Costs: $49.00 sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review; Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Silva, Phillip; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • DocketOff calendar; Comment: Off calendar for 7/16/2010 scheduled for CCR Hearing (clerk's judgment filed) . se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed; Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Antonia Ramirez and Juan B Ramirez li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DocketFile forwarded; Comment: File forwarded to: Commissioner P Silva for signature. li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Antonia Ramirez , mailed on 02/02/2010. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Antonia Ramirez on 02/02/2010 . sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLSE6876.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. sr Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee; Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd; Comment: Notice of CCR hearing set for 07/16/2010 at 1:30 pm in Selma. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kings Credit Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jolly, Tim