This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 16:40:40 (UTC).

Kings Credit Services vs Surina L Carlos/CC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2009 Kings Credit Services filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Surina L Carlos/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1141

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services

Defendant

Carlos, Surina L

Other

Seiler, Surina L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Giuliani, Jennifer Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2009
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • Writ filed wholly unsatisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. Deft. filed bankruptcy psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL28709.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of FRESNO in the amount of $3103.51 PSN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 01/21/10. judgment entered. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 12/08/09 for plaintiff Kings Credit Services against defendant Surina L Carlos aka Surina L Seiler in the sum of: Principal: $1,926.00 Interest: $ 465.99 Atty Fees: $ 481.50 Costs: $ 200.00 Total: $3,073.49 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • Order filed- Comment: Order setting attorney fees signed by Judge Fain filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order: order setting attorney fees Forwarded to: Judge Fain vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $5.02 Costs: $0.00 PSN

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2009
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration and application of Peter Laughlin for attorney fees pursuant to ccp 585(a) as required by ccp 585(d) filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of due diligence filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Sharon, person in charge of the business, mailed on 08/24/09. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$176.00 was made on receipt CLCL26416.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 31-JUL-2009 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.