This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:44 (UTC).

Kings Credit Services vs. Mercedes Wiggins/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Kings Credit Services filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mercedes Wiggins/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2086

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services

Defendant

Wiggins, Mercedes

Others

Ruiz, Mercedes

Puente, Mercedes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Maroot & Hardcastle 429 N. Redington St. Po Box 1759

Hanford, CA 93232

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed; Comment: Mercedes Wiggins

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly satisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed; Comment: Mercedes Wiggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE336845.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 1,243.61 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 6.63 Costs: $ 0.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 5/2/14 for plaintiff Kings Credit Services a corporation against defendant Mercedes Wiggins aka Mercedes Ruiz aka Mercedes Puente in the sum of: Principal: $ 658.00 Interest: $ 184.48 Atty Fees: $ 164.50 Costs: $ 205.00 Total: $1,211.98 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Order filed- Comment: Order the court having considered the foregoing declaration under ccp 585(d) as required by ccp 585(a) sets attorney fees in this action in the amount of $164.50 signed by Judge Dupras filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order: attorney fees Forwarded to: dept 404 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/clerk's judgment sef

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration and application of Peter Laughlin for attorney fees pursuant to ccp 585(a) as required by ccp 585(d) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on John Doe, Refused name, Husband, mailed on 1/28/14 . ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of Reasonable Dilgience of Mercedes Wiggins aka Mercedes Ruiz aka Mercedes Puente filed. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325293.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less