Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 12:19:11 (UTC).

Kings Credit Services vs Charles M Ricks/CC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2011 Kings Credit Services filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Charles M Ricks/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0327

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kings Credit Services, a Corporation

Defendants

Ricks, Chalres M

Ricks, Tracy L

Others

Morelock, Tracy L

Anderson, Tracy L

Ricks, Charlie

Smith, Tracy L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jolly, Tim

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Substitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Jennifer Giuliani New atty: Tim Jolly. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • Satisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed ER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • Writ filed wholly satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. cr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL36368.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Tulare in the amount of $1,436.65. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $2.96 Costs: $55.00 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL35786.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 08/01/11 for plaintiff Kings Credit Services against defendant(s) Charles M Ricks aka Charlie Ricks; Tracy L Ricks aka Tracy L Anderson aka Tracy L Morelock aka Tracy L Smith in the sum of: Principal: $855.41 Interest: $64.43 Atty Fees: $213.85 Costs: $220.00 Total: $1,353.69 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration and application of Peter Laughlin for attorney fees pursuant to CCP 585(a) as required by CCP 585(d) filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Tracy L Ricks aka Tracy L Anderson aka Tracy L Morelock aka Tracy L Smith on 4/1/2011 . kjr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration Due Diligence filed. kjr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Tracy L. Ricks, Spouse on 4/1/2011, mailed on 4/1/2011 . kjr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL34137.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kings Credit Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jolly, Tim