This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:41:34 (UTC).

Kim Chuor & Thy Tak vs.McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC, et al.//COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 Kim Chuor Thy Tak filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC, //COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0678

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Valero, Rolando

Twohey-Walker, Monica Rose

Durham, Gary & Rhonda

Hebron, Terrance

Toral, Suzanna

Klar, Jaspreet

Salcido, Mark

Thompson, Mayra R.

Ramirez, Brian & Vanessa

Yusuf, Luqman

Rodriguez, Arturo & Melissa

Jurado, Joel

Castillo, Enrique & Blanca

Thy Tak, Kim Chuor &

Defendant

McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC, et al.

Cross Plaintiffs

JR Concrete, Inc.

Kings Drywall, Inc.

Walltech, Inc.

Elia Painting Contractors, Inc.

Cencal Drywall, Inc.

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hamblin, Lauren

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Correll, Deborah A.

Other Attorneys

Wilkins, James H.

McElroy, Julie D.

Lillig, Rebecca M.

Gorman, Patrick J.

Moore, Penny S.

Nakagawa, Edwin S.

Taylor, Sandra F.

Morrow, William D

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons on Complaint 2-15-17.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - MATTHEW S QUALITY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Central Air Conditioning, Inc.

Order Received for Signature

CHUOR - PROPOSED ORDER.docx.pdf; Comment: Proposed Order Granting Leave to Intervene

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Pre-trial Order No. 4

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - King's Drywall, Inc.

Case Management Statement Filed

CMS for 2-8-18 CMC (1-24-18) SIGNED.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - ANLIN INDUSTRIES

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Comment: (As to Defendant in 1st Cross-Complaint); Party Name: Arakelian, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - KENNIES INDOOR COMFORT SPECIALISTS, INC.

Objection filed

CASR 05937 PTO OBJECTIONS 022818.pdf; Comment: CROSS-DEFENDANT KENNIES INDOOR COMFORT SPECIALISTS, INC.???S OBJECTION AND NON-CONSENT TO PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 1

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Pre-Trial Order No, 5

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Ntc. of Dismissal (Airport & Arakelian).pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal - F.G. Electric

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Request for Dismissal - CENTRAL AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Summons issued and filed

Summons on Cross-Complaint.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on Cross Complaint

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: to Appoint Special Master

226 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Bronco Concrete, Inc.; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: J.R. Nelson Roofing, Inc.; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: J. Lopez Construction, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Matthew's Quality Construction, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Tom Besmer Construction, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Royce Nalls & Son Masonry; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Beltran Concrete, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: JT Landscape; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Champagne Landscape Nursery, Inc; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
344 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • Financial info for Airport Specialty Products, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Financial: Airport Specialty Products, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,555.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,555.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Financial info for McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-18077 McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Financial info for McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Financial: McMillin Rustic Oaks, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Financial info for Rodriguez, Arturo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-36923 Rodriguez, Arturo $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Financial info for Rodriguez, Arturo: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial info for Rodriguez, Arturo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-11282 Rodriguez, Arturo & Melissa $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial info for Rodriguez, Arturo: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial: Rodriguez, Arturo; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.