This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 14:40:50 (UTC).

Kevin Woods vs Brianne Woods

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 Kevin Woods filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brianne Woods. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Zepeda, Francine, Mangano, Robert and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3315

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Zepeda, Francine

Mangano, Robert

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Woods, Kevin

Respondent

Woods, Brianne

Minors

Woods, Landon

Woods, Peyton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gates, Kristen M

Respondent Attorney

Morrison, Jennifer S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketMotion - Bifurcate- Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: 2107 waiver and for a settlement conf to divide assets & debts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Brianne Woods served 2/7/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSelf Help FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOSC/Motions filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: HRG: 12/11/2019 Judicial Officer: D. Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: C Vang Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: NP Time: 10:30am Petitioner: Present Respondent: Not Present Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date:12/8/2020 Time: 10:30a.m Dept: 202 Other:Petitioner is present and has been assisted by a staff from the Self-Help Center. Matter continued for further case status conference. Petitioner to notify the opposing party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney- Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: HRG: 8/7/2019 Judicial Officer: D. Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: R. Lundy Time: 10:49 am Petitioner not present/Gaytan obo Gates Respondent present Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 12/11/19 Time: 10:30 a.m Dept: 202 Parties are working on case. Matter continued for further case status conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docket2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 2 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Respondent: Woods, Brianne

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion - Re: CC/V, CS & SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: FL Calendar - Petitioner's fee waiver docs to be set for fee waiver hearing (with file)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: sent Fee Waiver to FLEX for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Accepted Pending Judge's Review/Signature - Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.