This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:49 (UTC).

Keng Vang vs. David Martinez/Dismissed

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Keng Vang filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Martinez/Dismissed. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Bruce and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3841

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Bruce

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vang, Keng

Defendant

Martinez, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nunes, Frank M.

2505 W. Shaw Avenue Suite 180 Law Offices Frank M. Nunes Inc

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant Attorney

Carter, Daniel L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Jury Trial- Original Type: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Original Type: Trial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for JT scheduled for 2-2-15. Dismissed gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for TRR scheduled for 1-30-15. Dismissed gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for MSC scheduled for 1-7-15. Dismissed gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed Without prejudice. gs Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Notice of change of address- Comment: Notice of change of address of Deutinger and Wells. bd

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2014
  • Financial info for Martinez, David: Counter Payment Receipt # 188801 Martinez, David $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Financial info for Martinez, David: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Financial info for Martinez, David: Counter Payment Receipt # 186968 Martinez, David $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Financial info for Martinez, David: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Financial: Martinez, David; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Financial info for Vang, Keng: Counter Payment Receipt # 189708 Vang, Keng $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Financial info for Vang, Keng: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Financial info for Vang, Keng: Counter Payment Receipt # 186459 Vang, Keng $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Financial info for Vang, Keng: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Financial: Vang, Keng; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less