This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 18:38:23 (UTC).

Kelly Hernandez vs.Pom Wonderful Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 Kelly Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Pom Wonderful Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2016

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Kelly

Defendants

Randstad US LP

Hernandez, Hazel

Placement Pros

Pom Wonderful Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitten, Amanda B.

Defendant Attorneys

Fitch, Lindsay S.

Moran, Matthew D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Reply In Support Of Pom Wonderful Holdings Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: In Support Of Plaintiff s Opposition To Defendants Randstad Us, L.p., And Hazel Hernandez s Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: In Support Of Plaintiff s Opposition To Defendant Pom Wonderful Holdings Llc s Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Pending The Outcome Of Arbitration

Notice of Motion

DEFENDANT??? NOTICE OF MOTION; Comment: and Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion filed

Motion; Comment: And Motion To: Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings Pending The Outcome Of Arbitration; And Notice Of Joinder In Defendants Randstad's And Hernandez's Motion To Compel Arbitration

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: to extend time for POM Wonderful Holdings LLC to respond

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Reply filed

DEFENDANTS RANDSTAD US, L.P. AND HAZEL HERNANDEZ??? REPLY; Comment: DEFENDANTS RANDSTAD US, L.P. AND HAZEL HERNANDEZ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION OF HAZEL HERNANDEZ; Comment: Hazel Hernandez in support of motion to compel arbitration

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation and Order; Comment: *NO ACTION TAKEN. ORDER NOT PROVIDED* Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POM Wonderful Holdings, LLC

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: First Amended Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: First Amended Summons

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Civil Judge for all Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Hernandez, Kelly; Pom Wonderful Holdings, LLC; Randstad US LP; Hernandez, Hazel; Comment: With prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action; Each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Case Stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fees Posted on Behalf of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Taken Under Submission/Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: Petition Compel Arbitration (x2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Petition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Sophie Froelich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Petition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Michael Harvey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed- Reply; Comment: Reply In Support Of Pom Wonderful Holdings Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2016
  • Financial: Pom Wonderful Holdings, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-48163 Hernandez, Kelly $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00023492 Dynamic Legal Services $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Transaction Assessment $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00023134 Sacramento Legal Support, Inc. $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Transaction Assessment $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00022846 Whitten, Amanda B. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Kelly: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Financial: Hernandez, Kelly; Total Financial Assessment $604.00; Total Payments and Credits $604.00

    Read MoreRead Less