This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:55:39 (UTC).

Kay De Fehr vs. Kevin Heinz

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 Kay De Fehr filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Kevin Heinz. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Dalesandro, Samuel, Gaab, Kimberly, Diaz, Monica and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3799

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Dalesandro, Samuel

Gaab, Kimberly

Diaz, Monica

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

De Fehr, Kay M

Defendants

De Fehr II, Jack

De Fehr, Jack Doyle

Ronne, Amber

De Fehr, Harry Alex

Heinz, Kevin

Brenninger, Paul

Emmett, Patricia Faye

Lafayette College

Receivables Acquisition & Management Corp.

De Fehr, Cathie

Baer, Cynthia

Ronne, Jr, Lewis E

Nolan, Erin

Aaron Realty Group

County of Fresno

City of Fresno

De Fehr, Gary Arthur

Pat Faye Emmett

Brenninger, Kathryn

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wishon, A E, III

Ryan, Russell K.

Defendant Attorney

Jorgensen, Kenneth J.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Brenninger, Ty; Comment: With Prejudice.

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment Amber Ronne; Comment: Amber Ronne

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment Cathie De Fehr; Comment: Cathie De Fehr

Request Filed

Request for Evidentiary Hearing; Comment: Request for Evidentiary Hearing

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal Kathryn Brenninger; Comment: Request for Dismissal Kathryn Brenninger

Notice Filed

Disclaimer of Interest Elisa Ziganti; Comment: Disclaimer of Interest Elisa Ziganti

Request Filed

Request for Evidentiary Hearing; Comment: Request for Evidentiary Hearing

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Proof of Service

Amended Proof of Service - Amber Ronne; Comment: Amended Proof of Service - Amber Ronne

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal-City of Fresno; Comment: Request for Dismissal-City of Fresno

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal Aaron Realty Group; Comment: Request for Dismissal Aaron Realty Group

Notice Filed

Disclaimer of Interest Kathryn Brenninger; Comment: Disclaimer of Interest Kathryn Brenninger

Proof of Service

Proof of Service Amber Ronne; Comment: Amber Ronne

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

166 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lafayette College; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Brenninger, Paul; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Ronne, Jr, Lewis E; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: City of Fresno; Comment: with prejudice as to Defendant City of Fresno ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Nolan, Erin; Comment: with prejudice as to Defendant Erin Nolan Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Aaron Realty Group; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: De Fehr, Cathie; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Brenninger, Ty; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Brenninger, Kathryn; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Ziganti, Elisa K.; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
201 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial: City of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Financial info for De Fehr, Kay M: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-45082 De Fehr, Kay M $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Financial info for De Fehr, Kay M: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for De Fehr, Kay M: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54211 De Fehr, Kay M $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for De Fehr, Kay M: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial: De Fehr, Kay M; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less