This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 22:54:39 (UTC).

Karina Cholula vs.Pitman Family Farms, Inc. // COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 Karina Cholula filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Pitman Family Farms, Inc // COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2379

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cholula, Karina

Defendant

Pitman Family Farms, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Ari E.

Defendant Attorney

Ryan, Russell K.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of reassignment of judge for all purposes ** AS OF 2/26/18**

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attachment

Amended Document Filed

First Amended Answer; Comment: First Amended Answer

Answer Filed

Answer to Class Action Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attached.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: ORDER ON "CLASS" CASE AS COMPLEX AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of reassignment of judge for all purposes ** AS OF 2/26/18**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- First Amended Answer; Comment: First Amended Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer to Class Action Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Financial info for Pitman Family Farms, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-56955 Pitman Family Farms, Inc. $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Financial info for Pitman Family Farms, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Financial: Pitman Family Farms, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for Cholula, Karina: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-31787 Cholula, Karina $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for Cholula, Karina: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial: Cholula, Karina; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less