This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:27:29 (UTC).

Karen Coletti vs Reno Coletti

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Karen Coletti filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Reno Coletti. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Meehan, Kathleen A and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6659

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Meehan, Kathleen A

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Coletti, Karen

Respondent

Coletti, Reno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Rusca, Rose Marie

1327 N. Street

Fresno, CA 93721

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: CONVERSION, JUDGE; Judgment Type: Final Judgment Dissolution/MSA; Party Names: Coletti, Karen; Coletti, Reno; Comment: Status Ends on 07/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Withdraw of Attorney- Comment: Attorney Withdrawing: Rosemarie Rusca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Withdraw of Attorney- Comment: Attorney Withdrawing: Richard A Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Conformed copies placed in runner box 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Hearing- Judicial Officer: Meehan, Kathleen A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: Meehan, Kathleen A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: set over phone with Atty R.ruscas office Other:Crt order to obtain exp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Motion - Attorney Fees- Judicial Officer: Meehan, Kathleen A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Set over phone with Atty R.Ruscas office

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2014
  • Financial info for Coletti, Reno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Financial: Coletti, Reno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2016-00003697 Coletti, Karen $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Transaction Assessment $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Counter Payment Receipt # 236487 Coletti, Karen $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Counter Payment Receipt # 215891 Coletti, Karen $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Coletti, Karen: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Coletti, Karen; Total Financial Assessment $1,050.00; Total Payments and Credits $555.00

    Read MoreRead Less